Jeley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Aden Y. Jeley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv03107
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Farrell, Clifford)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Farrell, Clifford)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Farrell, Clifford)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ameenah Lewis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Lewis, Ameenah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Aden Y. Jeley. (jlk)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 25, 2019. (jlk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Aden Y. Jeley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Farrell, Clifford)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jlk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Aden Y. Jeley. (jlk)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Scheduling in accordance with the Magistrate Judges General Order Concerning Social Security Appeals (S.D. Ohio E.D. January 1, 2016) and Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 18, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (jlk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Plaintiff to complete service) by Plaintiff Aden Y. Jeley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Summons Form Attorney General, #4 Summons Form US Attorney, #5 Summons Form Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aden Y. Jeley
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Ameenah Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?