Dague v. LoanCare LLC.
Plaintiff: Herman Dague
Defendant: LoanCare LLC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03175
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Reset deadlines pursuant to #4 : Answer due 10/10/2019. (ew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time in Which to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant LoanCare LLC.. (Carnahan, Benjamin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to LoanCare LLC. on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Thompson, Perry)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D Carnahan for Defendant LoanCare LLC. (Carnahan, Benjamin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against LoanCare LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7022829), filed by Herman Dague. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Perry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dague v. LoanCare LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare LLC.
Represented By: Benjamin D Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Dague
Represented By: Perry C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?