Centes v. Kirk et al
Plaintiff: Amie Centes
Defendant: Allen Price, Daniel Kirk and Paul Suffoletto
Case Number: 2:2019cv03208
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Amie Centes. (Kasson, D)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Responses due by 9/12/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/12/2019. (agm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/12/2019. by Plaintiff Amie Centes. (Kasson, D) Modified event type on 8/12/2019 (agm).
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendants Daniel Kirk, Paul Suffoletto. (Watson, Kristin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 7/10/2019 by Amie Centes against Daniel Kirk, Allen Price and Paul Suffoletto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 D-F, #5 Exhibit 2) (er)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 6/20/2019 by Amie Centes against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (jlk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #6 Exhibit D-F) (er).
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV005047 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7027910), filed by Paul Suffoletto, Daniel Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, Suffoletto Summons, #3 Exhibit 3, Kirk Summons, #4 Exhibit 4, Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5, Suffoletto Summons Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6, Kirk Summons Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7, Case Schedule, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Watson, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centes v. Kirk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kirk
Represented By: Kristin Seifert Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Suffoletto
Represented By: Kristin Seifert Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amie Centes
Represented By: D Patrick Kasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?