James et al v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Plaintiff: Jill Wittman and Nancy James
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv03246
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry W Fissel for Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation (Fissel, Barry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #15 & #16 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel K. Bryson and Harper T. Segui. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/12/2019. (er)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #11 , #12 , #13 & #14 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Soffin, Lisa A. White, Gregory F. Coleman & Adam A. Edwards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/12/2019. (er)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #10 & #17 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea Gold and Hassan Zavareei. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/12/2019. (er)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 , #8 , & #9 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey M. Beyer, Maura C. Smith & Brian E. O'Donnell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/12/2019. (er)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103705) of Hassan Zavareei by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103697) of Harper T. Segui by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103689) of Daniel K. Bryson by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103687) of Adam A. Edwards by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103675) of Gregory F. Coleman by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103672) of Lisa White by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103661) of Rachel Soffin by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Georgia) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103649) of Andrea Gold by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103496) of Brian E. O'Donnell by Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Goldberg, Stuart)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103486) of Maura C. Smith by Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Goldberg, Stuart)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103456) of Jeffrey M. Beyer by Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Goldberg, Stuart)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J Goldberg for Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation (Goldberg, Stuart)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Schultz. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/8/2019. (ew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Sharp Electronics Corporation on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Cash, III, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7048873) of Matthew D. Schultz by Plaintiffs Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Cash, III, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sem)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sharp Electronics Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7032148), filed by Nancy James, Jill Wittman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Cash, III, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Wittman
Represented By: William Franklin Cash, III
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Matthew D. Schultz
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Hassan A Zavareei
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy James
Represented By: William Franklin Cash, III
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Matthew D. Schultz
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Hassan A Zavareei
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Brian E. O'Donnell
Represented By: Maura C. Smith
Represented By: Barry W Fissel
Represented By: Stuart J Goldberg
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?