BNSF Logistics, LLC v. Atkinson et al
Plaintiff: BNSF Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Mizer Transportation Services, LLC, Mizer Freight Services, LLC, Ohio Drayage LLC, Darcey Atkinson and Samantha Guilliams
Case Number: 2:2019cv03331
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Samantha Guilliams on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Hohenberger, Leah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ohio Drayage LLC on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Hohenberger, Leah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Mizer Freight Services, LLC on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Hohenberger, Leah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Darcey Atkinson on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Hohenberger, Leah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs BNSF Logistics, LLC, Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, National Indemnity Company, OBH LLC, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, Other Affiliate OBH LLC, Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company for BNSF Logistics, LLC.. (Hohenberger, Leah)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wayne L. Robbins, Jr filed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 08/05/2019. (mdr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7042948) of Wayne L. Robbins, Jr. by Plaintiff BNSF Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hohenberger, Leah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Wayne L. Robbins, Jr. (mdr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Darcey Atkinson, Mizer Freight Services, LLC, Mizer Transportation Services, LLC, Ohio Drayage LLC, filed by BNSF Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Limited & Particular Purpose Agency Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Tri-Party Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-BNSF Logistics Transportation Provider Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hohenberger, Leah)
August 1, 2019 Filing fee received: $400. Receipt number: 0648-7041450. (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Logistics, LLC v. Atkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizer Transportation Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizer Freight Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Drayage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcey Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Guilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Leah M Hohenberger
Represented By: Wayne L Robbins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?