Prystasz et al v. Shumaker et al
Plaintiff: Gary Prystasz and Debra Prystasz
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company, Precision Transport Company and Timothy Shumaker
Case Number: 2:2019cv03355
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Erie Insurance Company, Precision Transport Company, Timothy Shumaker. (Shah, Mohammad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
August 2, 2019 Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 08/02/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-633. Case assigned to Judge George C. Smith and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura.. (jlw)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1, this case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/2/2019. (jlw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Precision Transport Company, Timothy Shumaker. (Roth, Timothy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Precision Transport Company, Timothy Shumaker. (Roth, Timothy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Precision Transport Company, Timothy Shumaker filed by Erie Insurance Company. Filed in Monroe County Court of Common Pleas on July 18, 2019. (jlw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Erie Insurance Company, Precision Transport Company, Timothy Shumaker, filed by Debra Prystasz, Gary Prystasz. Filed in Monroe County Court of Common Pleas on 7/3/2019 (jlw)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendants Precision Transport Company, timothy shumaker re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Coversheet (Roth, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Precision Transport Company. (Roth, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Court of Common Pleas, case number CVH 2019-216 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7040280), filed by Precision Transport Company, timothy shumaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Email, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint with Discovery to Defendants, #5 Exhibit Answer of Erie Insurance and Cross-claim, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Roth, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prystasz et al v. Shumaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Francis Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Transport Company
Represented By: Timothy P Roth
Represented By: Mohammad Salman Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Shumaker
Represented By: Timothy P Roth
Represented By: Mohammad Salman Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Prystasz
Represented By: Justin Wiater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Prystasz
Represented By: Justin Wiater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?