Holladay v. Akramkhodjaev et al
Plaintiff: Carol Holladay
Defendant: Nextran Corporation, Amazon Logistics, Inc., Wawanesa General Insurance Company, Akmalkuja Akramkhodjaev, DM World Transportation, John and/or Jane Doe and Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03410
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The October 9, 2019 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2020. Motions to Amend due by 3/2/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 11/29/2019. Discovery (Fact) due by 6/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2020. Primary Expert due by 7/31/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/30/2020. Settlement Demand due by 12/1/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 12/18/2019. Mediation Deadline: 3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/3/2019. (daf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Akmalkuja Akramkhodjaev, DM World Transportation. (Porritt, Russell)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendant Wawanesa should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order unless she has applied for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/25/2019. (daf)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against DM World Transportation filed by DM World Transportation. (Porritt, Russell)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Crossclaim of Nextran Corporation filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Belzer, Geoffrey) Modified text and docket entry relationships on 8/30/2019 (ew).
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Belzer, Geoffrey)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey A. Belzer for Cross Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Belzer, Geoffrey) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/20/2019) (er).
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Akmalkuja Akramkhodjaev, DM World Transportation. (Dane, Dee) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (ew).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand, filed by Nextran Corporation, Nextran Corporation d/b/a Nextran Rental & Leasing and CROSSCLAIM against Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. and DM World Transportation. (er)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 7/2/2019 by Carol Holladay against Akmalkuja Akramkhodjaev, Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., DM World Transportation, John and/or Jane Doe, Nextran Corporation, Nextran Corporation & Wawanesa General Insurance Company. (er)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas filed by DM World Transportation and Akmalkuja Akramkhodjaev, case number 19cv005388. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Complaint, #4 State Answer and Crossclaim) (er)
August 7, 2019 Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura added. (er)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE by Defendants AKMALKUJA AKRAMKHODJAEV, DM WORLD TRANSPORTATION NOTICE OF FILING (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Dane, Dee) ***DOCUMENT REMOVED by the CLERK on 8/7/2019 - documents were corrupted. The Clerk has refiled them under entry #2 (er).
August 7, 2019 Filing fee for removal: $ 400, receipt number 0648-7051099. (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holladay v. Akramkhodjaev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextran Corporation
Represented By: Kevin W Popham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawanesa General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akmalkuja Akramkhodjaev
Represented By: Russell W Porritt
Represented By: Dee A. Dane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DM World Transportation
Represented By: Russell W Porritt
Represented By: Dee A. Dane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Holladay
Represented By: Douglas J Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?