Neff v. Arnold Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph H Neff
Defendant: Robert F. Kiel and Arnold Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03435
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 is VACATED. Case is referred to mediation in January 2020. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 10/11/2019. Initial Disclosures due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. Primary Expert due by 11/1/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 12/31/2019. Settlement Demand due by 11/1/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/3/2019. (ew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Arnold Transportation, Inc., Robert F. Kiel. (Pappalardo, Joseph)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 @ 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Arnold Transportation, Inc., Robert F. Kiel. (Pappalardo, Joseph)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The related case Summers, et al. v. Arnold Transportation, Inc., et al., Case Number 2:18-cv-978, has been reported as settled. Accordingly, the Motion to Consolidate this case with Summers ECF No. #6 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/26/2019. (cmw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Telephone Conference scheduled for 8/26/2019 at 2:00 p.m. has been VACATED. (cmw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER VACATING the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/19 pending a ruling on the Motion to Consolidate #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/21/19. (jr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:18-cv-978 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George C. Smith and Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/20/2019. (daf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Joseph H Neff (Meizlish, Sanford)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Arnold Transportation, Inc., Robert F. Kiel. (Pappalardo, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Arnold Transportation, Inc. answer due 8/15/2019; Robert F. Kiel answer due 8/15/2019. (mdr) **Please disregard as set in error. Modified on 8/12/2019 (mdr).
August 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Arnold Transportation, Inc. and Robert F. Kiel filed by Joseph H Neff (State Court Complaint filed in the Court of Common Pleas, Franklin County, Ohio on 7/31/19). (sem)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Arnold Transportation, Inc., Robert F. Kiel, Parker Global Enterprises, U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Parker Global Enterprises, Other Affiliate U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc. for Arnold Transportation, Inc... (Pappalardo, Joseph)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendants Arnold Transportation, Inc., Robert F. Kiel re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover SHeet (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Pappalardo, Joseph)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19 CV 006188 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7053129), filed by Robert F. Kiel, Arnold Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing) (Pappalardo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neff v. Arnold Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F. Kiel
Represented By: Joseph W Pappalardo
Represented By: Mohammad Salman Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W Pappalardo
Represented By: Mohammad Salman Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H Neff
Represented By: Jason Charles Cox
Represented By: Sanford Alan Meizlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?