Primus Group, LLC v. Smith & Wesson Corp. et al
Plaintiff: PRIMUS GROUP, LLC
Defendant: COLT'S MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC, SIG SAUER, INC., BUSHMASTER FIREARMS INTERNATIONAL, DPMS FIREARMS, ARMALITE, REMINGTON ARMS COMPANY, LLC, STURM, RUGER & CO., INC. and SMITH & WESSON CORP.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03450
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2019 Notice of Appeal Filing fee of $ 505.00 (receipt number 0648-7183966) received by Plaintiff's counsel as to the 10/11/19 #38 Notice of Appeal. (sem)
October 15, 2019 Filing 39 USCA Case Number 19-3992 for #38 Notice of Appeal filed by Primus Group, LLC; case manager Robin L. Johnson, 513-564-7039. (er)
October 11, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss (FILING FEE DUE) by Plaintiff Primus Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Squire, Percy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/9/2019. (cmw)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER granting #30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/9/2019. (cmw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 35 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #32 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Primus Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Squire, Percy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss (REPLACE DOC. #29 filed by Defendants Armalite, Bushmaster Firearms International, Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC, DPMS Firearms, Remington Arms Company, LLC, Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Corp., Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Joyce is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/182019. (daf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $400, receipt number: 0648-7110598) of Robert L. Joyce by Defendants Armalite, Bushmaster Firearms International, Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC, DPMS Firearms, Remington Arms Company, LLC, Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Corp., Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Trafford, Robert) Modified payment made for this phv on 9/17/2019 (er).
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss (REPLACE DOC. #29 filed by Plaintiff Primus Group, LLC. (Squire, Percy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Primus Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Squire, Percy)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #27 & #28 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Renzulli and John F. Renzulli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/9/2019. (er)
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss (REPLACE DOC. #29 by Defendants Armalite, Bushmaster Firearms International, Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC, DPMS Firearms, Remington Arms Company, LLC, Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Corp., Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Armalite, Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC, Remington Arms Company, LLC, Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Corp., Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7084892) of John F. Renzulli by Defendant Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Trafford, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7084867) of Christopher Renzulli by Defendant Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Trafford, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Lothson and Edward Scheideman is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/29/2019. (daf)
August 28, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 200.00, receipt number 200COL058378 (daf)
August 28, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 200.00, receipt number 200COL058377 (daf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Edward Scheideman and Andrew Lothson (daf)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gayathiri Shanmuganatha is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/26/2019. (daf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 Transcript of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 8-20-19, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 9/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2019. (Coulter, Darla)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Remington Arms Company, LLC. (Trafford, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE PAID) of Andrew Lothson by Defendant Remington Arms Company, LLC. (Trafford, Robert) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (daf).
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE PAID) of Edward Scheideman by Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp.. (Trafford, Robert) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (daf).
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE PAID) $200.00 Receipt Number: 0648-7075980 of Gayathiri Shanmuganatha by Defendant Armalite. (Trafford, Robert) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (daf).
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Armalite. (Trafford, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James B. Vogts is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/22/2019. (daf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp.. (Trafford, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE PAID) $200.00 Receipt Number: 0648-7072007 of James Vogts by Defendant Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Trafford, Robert) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (daf).
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Trafford, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction set for 10/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #2 Motion for TRO. The parties shall adhere to the scheduling following Schedule: Defendants shall file any dispositive motions on or before 9/3/19. Plaintiff shall respond by 9/17/19. Defendants shall reply by 9/27/19. Hearing on Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction 10/15/19 at 1:30 p.m. before Chief Judge Sargus, Jr. courtroom number 2.. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/20/2019. (cmw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/20/2019. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ward Trafford for Defendant Armalite (Trafford, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ward Trafford for Defendants Bushmaster Firearms International, Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC, DPMS Firearms, Remington Arms Company, LLC, Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Corp., Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc. (Trafford, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephone Status Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Primus Group, LLC re #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, #7 Certificate of Service, Amended (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Squire, Percy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Primus Group, LLC re #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, VERIFIED LOCAL RULE 65.1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B) (Squire, Percy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Armalite, Bushmaster Firearms International, Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC, DPMS Firearms, Remington Arms Company, LLC, Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Corp. and Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc. (er)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Primus Group, LLC re #3 Notice (Other) TO CORRECT RECORD (Squire, Percy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Primus Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order, #3 Supplement Bond, #4 Supplement Notice) (Squire, Percy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff PRIMUS GROUP, LLC Notice of Appearance of Thomas D. Lambros as lead counsel for plaintiff (Squire, Percy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff PRIMUS GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Bond, #2 Text of Proposed Order Notice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Exhibit A) (Squire, Percy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR AN IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY WRIT ENJOINING THE DISTRIBUTION AND SALE OF ASSAULT WEAPONS, AND FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7054519), filed by PRIMUS GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Armalite, #4 Summons Form Bushmaster, #5 Summons Form Colt, #6 Summons Form DPMS, #7 Summons Form Remington, #8 Summons Form Sig Saur, #9 Summons Form Smith and Wesson, #10 Summons Form Sturm Ruger) (Squire, Percy) (Main Document & all attachments replaced on 8/9/2019- documents originally entered were unable to be combined as PDF document) (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primus Group, LLC v. Smith & Wesson Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLT'S MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: John F. Renzulli
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Represented By: Christopher Renzulli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIG SAUER, INC.
Represented By: Robert L Joyce
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUSHMASTER FIREARMS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPMS FIREARMS
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMALITE
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Represented By: Gayathiri Shanmuganatha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REMINGTON ARMS COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Represented By: Andrew Lothson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STURM, RUGER & CO., INC.
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Represented By: James B Vogts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH & WESSON CORP.
Represented By: Edward Scheideman
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Elizabeth L Moyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIMUS GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Percy Squire
Represented By: Thomas D. Lambros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?