Davis v. McClain et al
Plaintiff: Patricia K. Davis
Defendant: Jeff McClain, J. Does, Charles P. Rettig and Steven Terner Mnuchin
Case Number: 2:2019cv03466
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Patricia K. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and #2 Complaint, filed by Patricia K. Davis. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. It is also RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). ( Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2019) Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/19/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against J. Does, Jeff McClain, Steven Terner Mnuchin, and Charles P. Rettig, filed by Patricia K. Davis. (daf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Patricia K. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Forms, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (daf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. McClain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Terner Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia K. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?