Edwards v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Ahmed Edwards
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03493
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Woodard, Brandon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Ahmed Edwards. (DeWitt, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation Deadline: 3/2020. (daf)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Motions to Amend due by 10/1/2020. Discovery due by 6/5/2020. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 11/1/2019. Dispositive motions due by 8/6/2020. Primary Expert due by 3/5/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/5/2020. Settlement Demand due by 12/1/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/1/2020. Mediation Deadline: 2/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 10, 2019. (jlk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 9, 2019. (jlk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 9/9/2019. by Plaintiff Ahmed Edwards. (DeWitt, Michael)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE : The PPTC set for 9/5/2019 at 11:00 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. #7 .) (sln)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Woodard, Brandon)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Woodard, Brandon)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Southwest Airlines Co., filed by Ahmed Edwards. (daf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing Exhibit to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Woodard, Brandon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Woodard, Brandon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV005545 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7058311), filed by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket (State Court), #3 Exhibit 3 - All State Court Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Woodard, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Brandon A Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Edwards
Represented By: Michael W DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?