Smith et al v. Liberty Mortgage Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Benny L Smith and Della R Smith
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC, John Doe 1, Liberty Mortgage Company Inc, Does 1-100 Inclusive, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Government National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc., Ginnie Mae, MERS and UBS Securities LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03547
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
2 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 and #19 Motions for Extension of Time: Government National Mortgage Association answer due 10/31/2019; Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC answer due 11/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/11/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 11/5/2019. by Defendant Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 10/31/2019. by Defendant Government National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke D Turner-Bautista for Defendant Government National Mortgage Association (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint - Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC answer due 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/13/2019. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 10/15/2019. by Defendant Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke D Turner-Bautista for Defendant Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Government National Mortgage Association. Served on 8/26/2019. Answer due 9/16/2019. (ew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC. Served on 8/26/2019. Answer due 9/16/2019. (ew)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:18-cv-1035 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge George C. Smith and Magistrate Judge Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George C. Smith and Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/28/2019. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: The complaint and issued summons were sent via certified mail to Defendants Government National Mortgage Association and Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC. (ew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mortgage Company Inc; GMAC Mortgage, LLC; Government National Mortgage Association; Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC; UBS Securities LLC; and Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc. (ew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (ew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons re #6 . (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (ew)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/16/2019. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Benny L Smith, Della R Smith re #1 Complaint & #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (er)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Benny L Smith and Della R Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (er)
August 15, 2019 Filing fee for cv action: $ 400.00, receipt number 200COL058206. (er)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Della R Smith and Benny L Smith against Does 1-100 Inclusive, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Government National Mortgage Association, John Doe 1, Liberty Mortgage Company Inc and Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit H) (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Liberty Mortgage Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Serving, LLC
Represented By: Brooke D Turner-Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mortgage Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Brooke D Turner-Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginnie Mae
Represented By: Brooke D Turner-Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?