SW et al v. The United States of America U.S. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Lyndsey Wojcehowicz, Jeffrey Wojcehowicz and SW
Defendant: The United States of America U.S. Department of Justice, OhioHealth Corporation, MedCentral Health System, The United States of America, U.S. Attorney, Southern District of Ohio and Edward Zarczynski
Case Number: 2:2019cv03613
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants MedCentral Health System, OhioHealth Corporation. (Sprader, Bobbie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by MedCentral Health System, OhioHealth Corporation. (Sprader, Bobbie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Edward Zarczynski. (sem)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. EDWARD ZARCZYNSKI, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Skall, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to OhioHealth Corporation on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Skall, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to MedCentral Health System on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Skall, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The United States of America U.S. Department of Justice, The United States of America, U.S. Attorney, Southern District of Ohio, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Summons were issued for the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Ohio and the Attorney General of the United States). (sem)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Skall, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND with Attached Affidavit of Merit against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7069048), filed by SW, Lyndsey Wojcehowicz, Jeffrey Wojcehowicz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Skall, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SW et al v. The United States of America U.S. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OhioHealth Corporation
Represented By: Bobbie Sprader
Represented By: Karen Louise Clouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedCentral Health System
Represented By: Bobbie Sprader
Represented By: Karen Louise Clouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America, U.S. Attorney, Southern District of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Zarczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndsey Wojcehowicz
Represented By: David W. Skall
Represented By: Michael F Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wojcehowicz
Represented By: David W. Skall
Represented By: Michael F Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SW
Represented By: David W. Skall
Represented By: Michael F Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?