Kitchen v. Ross County Court of Common Pleas
Defendant: Ross County Court of Common Pleas
Petitioner: Michael Kitchen
Case Number: 2:2019cv03618
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Petitioner Michael Kitchen re #3 MOTION to Stay Retrial (Sesser, Stephen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT #4 MOTION to Stay Retrial by Petitioner Michael Kitchen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to Stay Retrial) (Sesser, Stephen)
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ross County Court of Common Pleas answer date. (daf)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Respondent shall file an answer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases within SIXTY (60) DAYS of the date of this Order. Petitioner may, not later than TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS after the answer is filed, file and serve a Traverse to the answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/20/2019. (daf)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0648-7069610.), filed by Michael Kitchen. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Summons Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sesser, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitchen v. Ross County Court of Common Pleas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Kitchen
Represented By: Stephen Kemmer Sesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross County Court of Common Pleas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?