Doe v. Logan-Hocking Local School District
Plaintiff: Mother Jane Doe
Defendant: Logan-Hocking Local School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv03697
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Logan-Hocking Local School District. (McIntosh, Sandra)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Logan-Hocking Local School District on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Fradin, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Logan-Hocking Local School District. (daf)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Fradin, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (er)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jane Doe Civil Cover Sheet (Fradin, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Logan-Hocking Local School District ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7078951), filed by Jane Doe. (Fradin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Logan-Hocking Local School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mother Jane Doe
Represented By: Michael Fradin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan-Hocking Local School District
Represented By: Sandra R McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?