Hepburn-Galbraith v. Navajo Shippers et al
Plaintiff: Heather A Hepburn-Galbraith
Defendant: John A boswinkle and navajo shippers
Case Number: 2:2019cv03750
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Set Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Motions to Amend due by 11/29/2019. (ew)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 10/31/2019; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 11/29/2019; Discovery due by 6/26/2020; Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2020; Primary Expert due by 4/20/2020; Rebuttal Expert due by 5/29/2020; Settlement Demand due by 2/3/2020; Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/28/2020; Case is referred to Mediation in 3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/1/2019. (kk2)
October 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/1/2019. (sln)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Order. Received by Heather A. Hepburn-Galbraith on 9/24/2019. (ew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Order. Received by William Campbell, Esq. on 9/23/2019. (ew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Heather A. Hepburn-Galbraith. (Campbell, William)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Campbell for Plaintiff Heather A. Hepburn-Galbraith (Campbell, William) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/23/2019) (er).
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE: The #8 Order has been mailed via email, regular U.S. mail and certified mail to William Campbell, (7009 2820 0003 5796 7759); and to Heather A. Hepburn-Galbraith (7009 2820 0003 5796 7742) as directed. (jlk)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The preliminary pretrial conference set for October 1, 2019 #6 is VACATED. Attorney Campbell is ORDERED to file within 14 DAYS a notice clarifying whether he will represent Plaintiff in this action and if so, move for admission pro hac vice due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 18, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Mail sent to Heather A. Hepburn-Galbraith returned as undeliverable. Contents include: #6 Notice of Hearing. (ew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. )
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney William P. Campbell. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 5/20/2019 by Navajo Shippers and John A. Boswinkle. (ew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Navajo Shippers and John A. Boswinkle originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 4/10/2019 by Heather A. Hepburn-Galbraith. (ew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Navajo Shippers. (Pappalardo, Joseph) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (ew).
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 19CV002992 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7085446), filed by John A boswinkle, navajo shippers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Pappalardo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hepburn-Galbraith v. Navajo Shippers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A boswinkle
Represented By: Joseph W Pappalardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: navajo shippers
Represented By: Joseph W Pappalardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather A Hepburn-Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?