Hines v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Lori Hines
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04153
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Harter, William)
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Liberty Insurance Corporation answer due 9/26/2019. (mdr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Logan County Court of Common Pleas as Case No. CV1908253 on 9/21/2019 against Liberty Insurance Corporation, filed by Lori Hines. (mdr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Harter, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Logan County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 08 0253, filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lower court filings., #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Harter, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing fee (Removal): $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7114958 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: William M Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Hines
Represented By: Robert A. Rutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?