Plain Local School District Board of Education v. Demaria
Plaintiff: Plain Local School District Board of Education
Defendant: Paolo Demaria
Case Number: 2:2019cv04246
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to refund the filing fee for this civil action to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/22/19. (jk)
October 18, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education (Martinsek, Amanda)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education to Withdrawal as Counsel (Watchorn, Christine)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference Proceedings held on 10/03/2019, before Judge Michael H. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lahana DuFour, Telephone number 614-719-3286. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020. (DuFour, Lahana)
October 3, 2019 NOTATION ORDER - Pursuant to the telephone conference held on 10/3/19, the Court DENIES #2 Motion for TRO. (jk)
October 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Telephone Conference held on 10/3/2019. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED Document re #5 Notice of Appearance by Frank J Reed, Jr and Stephen E. Chappelear for Defendant Paolo Demaria. (Reed, Frank) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (ew).
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J Reed, Jr and Stephen E. Chappelear for Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education (Reed, Frank) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (ew). Doc 5 has been restricted by the Clerk; for Amended Document of Notice, see #6 on 10/2/2019 (er).
October 2, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Status Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. Counsel are to call 888.684.8852, access code 3470668#. (jk)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE - Initial Conference scheduled for 10/2/19 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. (jk)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing - Initial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 - Columbus before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E Watchorn for Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education (Watchorn, Christine)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education Certification of Counsel Under Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Martinsek, Amanda)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Comparison Document, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Memo re School District Territory Transfer) (Martinsek, Amanda)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paolo Demaria ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7121119), filed by Plain Local School District Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Verification to Complaint) (Martinsek, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plain Local School District Board of Education v. Demaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plain Local School District Board of Education
Represented By: Amanda Martinsek
Represented By: Timothy J Downing
Represented By: Rachael Leigh Rodman
Represented By: William D Edwards
Represented By: Rex A Littrell
Represented By: Christine E Watchorn
Represented By: Daniela Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paolo Demaria
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?