Williams v. Rolling, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brady Williams
Defendant: John Doe Company, Atma Rai Singh, Forward Rolling, LLC and Davinder Singh
Case Number: 2:2019cv04302
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Atma Rai Singh on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Gonzales, John)
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Forward Rolling, LLC on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Gonzales, John)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2020. Motions to Amend due by 2/15/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 11/30/2019. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2020. Primary Expert due by 8/15/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/15/2020. Settlement Demand due by 2/3/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 3/16/2020. Mediation Deadline: 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 23, 2019. (jlk)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE : The PPTC set for 10/22/2019 at 11:30 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. #8 .) (sln)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Brady Williams. (Gonzales, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Forward Rolling, LLC, Atma Rai Singh. (Kendall, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
September 27, 2019 Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division Case Number 1:19-cv-816. Case assigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sct)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to the Columbus Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, for reassignment to a Judge at that location. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/26/19. (sct)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Davinder Singh. Originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 9/23/19. (sct)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Brady Williams. Originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 8/16/19. (sct)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Forward Rolling, LLC. (Kendall, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV006702 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7125507), filed by Davinder Singh, Atma Rai Singh, Forward Rolling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - All Pleadings from Franklin County Case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1/21/19 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Kendall, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Rolling, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Williams
Represented By: John Manuel Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atma Rai Singh
Represented By: Douglas William Rennie
Represented By: Gregory A Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Rolling, LLC
Represented By: Douglas William Rennie
Represented By: Gregory A Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davinder Singh
Represented By: Douglas William Rennie
Represented By: Gregory A Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?