The County of Fayette, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The County of Fayette, Ohio and The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Jane Does 1-50, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Mallinckrodt, plc and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04347
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45065, filed 02/11/2020. (pb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSFER ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (pb)
February 5, 2020 Case transferred to District of USDC Northern District of Ohio.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (pb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Exhaustive List of Cases) (Holzhall, Vincent)
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Plaintiffs' Opposition to Certain Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Worcester, MA Remand Order, #2 Exhibit B - Illinois Public Risk Fund Remand Order, #3 Exhibit C - New Hampshire Hearing Transcript Excerpt, Nov. 6, 2017, #4 Exhibit D - Dallas County, TX Remand Order, #5 Exhibit E - Delta County, TX Remand Order, #6 Exhibit F - Van Zandt, TX Remand Order, #7 Exhibit G - Brooke County Commission, VA Stay Denial, #8 Exhibit H - Weber County, UT Stay Denial, #9 Exhibit I - Uintah County, UT et al. Stay Denial, #10 Exhibit J - Cambridge, MA Remand Order, #11 Exhibit K - Mecklenberg County, VA Memo & Remand Order, #12 Exhibit L - Greeneville County, SC Remand Order, #13 Exhibit M - Anderson County, SC Remand Order, #14 Exhibit MDL Doc. 736 - McKesson's Notice of Consent to Remand, #15 Exhibit MDL Doc. 904 - Cardinal's Notice of Consent to Remand, #16 Exhibit P - Commonwealth of Kentucky - AmerisourceBergen's Notice of Consent to Remand, #17 Exhibit Q - MDL Teleconference Transcript Excerpts, Dec. 13, 2017) (Davis, Donald)
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Remand and For Expedited Consideration filed by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Illinois Public Risk Fund Remand Order, #2 Exhibit B - El Monte, CA Remand Order, #3 Exhibit C - County of Kern, CA Remand Order, #4 Exhibit D - Fire & Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio Remand Order, #5 Exhibit E - City of Worcester v. Purdue Pharma L.P. Opinion Re Motion to Remand) (Davis, Donald)
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Remand and For Expedited Consideration filed by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Teleconference Transcript Excerpts, Dec. 13, 2017) (Davis, Donald)
November 1, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fayette County CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of US, #3 Exhibit 3 - MDL 2804 Order) (Holzhall, Vincent)
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fayette Co. CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Transfer Order 1, #6 Exhibit 6 - Noble County OH, #7 Exhibit 7 - Meigs County OH, #8 Exhibit 8 - Alameda CA Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Portland ME Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Melrose Park Ill. Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - Jacksonville Fla. Deferral Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - Delaware Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Osage OK Stay Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Pawnee OK Stay Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - Int'l Union Stay Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Jenks OK Stay Order, #17 Exhibit 17 - Seminole County - Stay Order, #18 Exhibit 18 - EDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit 19 - WDVA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Fauquier VA Stay Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - Prince Williams VA Stay Order, #22 Exhibit 22 - Order Granting Mtn to Stay, #23 Exhibit 23 - San Mateo Cal. Stay Order) (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/16/2019. (daf)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall have until the later of thirty (30) days after: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand (if one is filed); or (2) the entry of a decision by the JPML regarding transfer of this action to the MDL, to answer or move to dismiss the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/15/2019. (daf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/15/2019. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and for Expedited Consideration, #2 Exhibit Remand Orders) (Davis, Donald)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Other Affiliate Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Rice, Justin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Johnson & Johnson. (Rice, Justin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Davis, Donald)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER re 13 Notation Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Moving Defendants must answer or move to dismiss the Complaint by 30 days after a Court's decision on Plaintiffs' potential Motion to Remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/9/2019. (agm)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint. CVS Health Corporation answer due 11/6/2019; CVS Indiana, L.L.C. answer due 11/6/2019; CVS Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Cephalon, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Johnson & Johnson answer due 11/6/2019; Mallinckrodt, LLC answer due 11/6/2019; Ohio CVS Stores, LLC answer due 11/6/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. answer due 11/6/2019; Purdue Pharma, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; SpecGx LLC answer due 11/6/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co. answer due 11/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/8/2019. (agm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Callum Morris for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Morris, Callum)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clayton Hollon for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Hollon, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin)
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines (Based on doc #6 ): AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation answer due 10/28/2019; Cardinal Health, Inc. answer due 10/28/2019; McKesson Corporation answer due 10/28/2019. (er)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. New date requested 11/6/2019. (Rice, Justin) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (kk2)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental Notice of Removal by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket and Pleadings) (Holzhall, Vincent) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (er).
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendant McKesson Corporation of State Court Order Filed September 25, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Order) (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade, The County of Fayette, Ohio. (jlk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc, Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Rendon, Carole)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, Fayette County, Ohio, case number CVG 20190261 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7132831), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers and Complaint) (Rendon, Carole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County of Fayette, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I Holzhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Tera Nichole Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Tera Nichole Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio CVS Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Clayton Hollon
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Represented By: Callum Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Fayette, Ohio
Represented By: Jess Carter Weade
Represented By: Adam Daniel Fuller
Represented By: Elizabeth J Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Donald W Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade
Represented By: Jess Carter Weade
Represented By: Adam Daniel Fuller
Represented By: Elizabeth J Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Donald W Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?