Harrington v. Marathon Petroleum Corporation Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Raymond D. Harrington
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation Speedway LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00016
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Order signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison. The Court dismisses the complaint and the case is terminated. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/11/2020. (tb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified text on 2/12/2020 (kk2)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #2 . The Complaint is dismissed and the Clerk is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/11/2020. (tb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) filed by Raymond D. Harrington and RECOMMENDING that the Court DISMISS this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/27/20. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Raymond D. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint - Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Form, #5 USM forms, #6 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Marathon Petroleum Corporation Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond D. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?