Johnson et al v. Fuller et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Amy S Johnson and Mr. Robert C Johnson
Defendant: Mr. Timothy O'Brien Fuller and United Financial Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00071
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of George M. Kontos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on February 26, 2020. (jlk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7348091) of George M. Kontos and Christopher C. Inman by Plaintiffs Amy S Johnson, Robert C Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kontos Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Inman Certificate of Good Standing) (Marinacci, Michelle)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant United Financial Casualty Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Buchbinder, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Buchbinder for Defendant United Financial Casualty Company (Buchbinder, Robert)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to United Financial Casualty Company on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Buchbinder, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United Financial Casualty Company. (jlk)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Timothy O'Brien Fuller. (jlk)
January 8, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7266726 (jlk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. upon United Financial Casualty Company (Marinacci, Michelle)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. upon Timothy O'Brien Fuller (Marinacci, Michelle)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (Marinacci, Michelle) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (jlk).
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Robert C Johnson, Amy S Johnson. (Marinacci, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Fuller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Timothy O'Brien Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert Charles Buchbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Amy S Johnson
Represented By: Michelle Marinacci
Represented By: George M. Kontos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Robert C Johnson
Represented By: Michelle Marinacci
Represented By: George M. Kontos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?