Great Northern Insurance Company v. Heidelberg USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Red Architecture + Planning LLC, Humble Construction Co., Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc. and Heidelberg USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00111
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Humble Construction Co.. (Schockman, Douglas)
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Humble Construction Co.. (Schockman, Douglas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc.. Amendment to #9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel . (Hager, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward M. Ordonez. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/13/2020. (ew)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7330286) of Edward M. Ordonez by Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (McClelland, Craig)
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Red Architecture Planning LLC. (Fenton, Scott)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to and Jury Demand by Defendant Heidelberg USA, Inc.. (Ney, Peter)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Robert A. Hager substituting for Kyle A. Johnson as to Defendant Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc.. (Hager, Robert)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, filed by Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc.. (Johnson, Kyle)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Red Architecture Planning LLC on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Fenton, Scott)
January 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc.: Answer due 2/4/2020. (ew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Heidelberg USA, Inc.. (Ney, Peter)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION Leave to Plead by Defendant Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc.. (Johnson, Kyle)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Humble Construction Co. on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Duraney, Christine)
January 7, 2020 Set Deadlines: Answer due 1/14/2020. (ew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Heidelberg USA, Inc.; Red Architecture + Planning LLC; Humble Construction Co.; and Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc. originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 12/18/2019 by Great Northern Insurance Company. (ew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Heidelberg USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parents Heidelberger Americas Inc. and Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft. (Chapman, Michael) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (ew).
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 19CV010062 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7269398), filed by Heidelberg USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing (State Court), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Chapman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Heidelberg USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Architecture + Planning LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Woodward Hutson
Represented By: Scott Alan Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humble Construction Co.
Represented By: Douglas J Schockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jezerinac Geers & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M. Lovdahl
Represented By: Robert A. Hager
Represented By: Kyle A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidelberg USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chapman
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig A. McClelland
Represented By: Edward M. Ordonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?