United States of America v. Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Sang Joo Lee and Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01778
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark R. Rosman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on April 21, 2020. (jlk)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Defendants Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd., Sang Joo Lee of Certification Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 16(g) (O'Shaughnessy, Patrick)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7430905) of Mark R. Rosman by Defendants Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd., Sang Joo Lee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Shaughnessy, Patrick)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Emmet O'Shaughnessy for Defendants Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd., Sang Joo Lee (O'Shaughnessy, Patrick)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:18-cv-1456 & 2:19-cv-1037 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison & Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/9/2020. (kk2)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to File Document Under Seal re Notice of Related Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/9/2020. (kk2)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION with Defendants Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd. and Sang Joo Lee by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment) (Malek, Andrew)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE re Competitive Impact Statement by Plaintiff United States of America (Malek, Andrew) Modified text on 4/9/2020 (kk2).
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE re Explanation of Consent Decree Procedures by Plaintiff United States of America (Malek, Andrew) Modified text on 4/9/2020 (kk2)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to File Document Under Seal re Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Malek, Andrew)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Malek, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sang Joo Lee
Represented By: Patrick Emmet O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Mark R. Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jier Shin Korea Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick Emmet O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Mark R. Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Andrew M Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew M Malek
Represented By: J. Richard Doidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?