W et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: E L W and E W
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Behavioral Health, Inc. and United HealthGroup Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv02027
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan M. Lewis is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/27/2020. (daf)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7479096) of Jordan Lewis by Plaintiffs E L W, E W. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sparks, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION and ORDER granting #5 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Proceed Anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/12/2020. (daf)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Proceed Anonymously re #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs E L W, E W. (Sparks, Robert)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiffs must either move for leave to proceed anonymously or SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss this action without prejudice for failure to identify the names of the parties, WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/1/2020. (daf)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Jordan Lewis (daf)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs E L W, E W re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint - Insurance Plan) (Sparks, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7434256), filed by E L W. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sparks, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthGroup Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E L W
Represented By: Robert R Sparks
Represented By: Jordan M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E W
Represented By: Robert R Sparks
Represented By: Jordan M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?