Oneida Consumer, LLC et al v. Fox
Plaintiff: The Oneida Group, Inc., Anchor Hocking LLC and Oneida Consumer, LLC
Defendant: Elyse Fox
Case Number: 2:2020cv02043
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 7/8/2020 @10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge James L. Graham. (ds)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTATION ORDER Granting #16 , #17 and #18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Ballew, John R. Taylor and Robert E. Zaytoun entered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 06/09/2020. (mdr)
June 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7501034) of Robert E. Zaytoun by Defendant Elyse Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Robert E. Zaytoun Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Schuler, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7500980) of John R. Taylor by Defendant Elyse Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John R. Taylor Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Schuler, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7500894) of Matthew D. Ballew by Defendant Elyse Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matthew D. Ballew Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Schuler, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Nein for Defendant Elyse Fox (Nein, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G Cohen for Defendant Elyse Fox (Cohen, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G Schuler for Defendant Elyse Fox (Schuler, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2020 @10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge James L. Graham. (ds)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Anchor Hocking LLC, Oneida Consumer, LLC, The Oneida Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. - Declaration of Mark Eichhorn, #2 Exhibit A. - U.S. Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit B. - Oneida Authorized Dealer Policy, #4 Exhibit C. - Letter from January 20, 2020, #5 Exhibit D. - Letter from March 10, 2020, #6 Exhibit E. - Amazon Listing for Oneida, Camlynn, #7 Exhibit F. - Amazon Listing for Oneida, Juilliard, #8 Exhibit G. - Unauthorized Configurations by Finest Flatware, #9 Exhibit H. - Printout of www.finestflatware.com, #10 Exhibit I. - About Section of Fox's Facebook page, #11 Exhibit J. - Screenshot of Fox's Twitter Account, #12 Exhibit K. - Letter from April 16, 2020, #13 Text of Proposed Order) (Butler, Marla)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Elyse Fox on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTATION ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marla R. Butler entered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 04/27/2020. (mdr)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7437196) of Marla R. Butler by Plaintiffs Anchor Hocking LLC, Oneida Consumer, LLC, The Oneida Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. - Supporting Declaration, #2 Exhibit A. - Letter of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
April 23, 2020 Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 4/23/20, Case Number 1:20-cv-322. Case assigned to Judge James L. Graham and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sct)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring case from the docket of the Honorable Douglas R. Cole to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/23/20. (sct)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Elyse Fox. (er)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Oneida Group, Inc.. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Oneida Consumer, LLC. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Anchor Hocking LLC. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Oneida Consumer, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, Summons in a Civil Action (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elyse Fox, d/b/a Finest Flatware ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7434987), filed by Oneida Consumer, LLC, The Oneida Group, Inc., Anchor Hocking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - 1 - Notice of Termination of Authorized Dealer Agreement and Reseller Relationship, #3 Exhibit - 2 - Notice of Termination of Authorized Dealer Agreement and Reseller Relationship, #4 Exhibit - 3 - Continuing Unauthorized Use of Oneidas Trademarks, #5 Exhibit - 4 - Service Mark Principal Register, #6 Exhibit - 5 - Letter Chris Heimbach, #7 Exhibit - 6 - The Oneida Group Authorized Dealer Policy, #8 Exhibit - 7 - Product Detail, #9 Exhibit - 8 - Product Detail, #10 Exhibit - 9 - Product Detail, #11 Exhibit - 10 - Product Detail) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oneida Consumer, LLC et al v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Oneida Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk
Represented By: Marla R. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anchor Hocking LLC
Represented By: Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk
Represented By: Marla R. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oneida Consumer, LLC
Represented By: Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk
Represented By: Marla R. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elyse Fox
Represented By: Jeffrey J Nein
Represented By: Matthew D Ballew
Represented By: Robert G Schuler
Represented By: John R Taylor
Represented By: Robert G Cohen
Represented By: Robert E. Zaytoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?