Bookmyer v. PNC Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan and Boytan & Associates, LLP
Defendant: CME Federal Credit Union, PNC Bank N.A., ABC Banks 1-100, The Huntington National Bank, N.A., Fifth Third Bank N.A., Celtic Bank, Telhio Credit Union, Kabbage, Inc., Radius Bank, Bluevine Capital Inc., TD Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02284
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (daf)
January 5, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP (Carwile, Tiffany)
December 21, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., CME Federal Credit Union, Celtic Bank, Fifth Third Bank N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank N.A., TD Bank, N.A., Telhio Credit Union, The Huntington National Bank, N.A. Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rice, Danielle)
December 10, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. FIFTH THIRD BANK, N.A., CELTIC BANK CORPORATION, PNC BANK, N.A., HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK, CME FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, TELHIO CREDIT UNION, TD BANK, N.A., AND JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Fleming, Daniel)
November 30, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP re #112 Notice (Other), #111 Notice (Other) (Carwile, Tiffany)
November 25, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., CME Federal Credit Union, Celtic Bank, Fifth Third Bank N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank N.A., TD Bank, N.A., Telhio Credit Union, The Huntington National Bank, N.A. OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - American Video II Decision) (Pitcher, Kelly)
November 20, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE by Defendants CME Federal Credit Union, Celtic Bank, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., TD Bank, N.A., Telhio Credit Union of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-American Video Decision) (Harrison, Gregory)
November 12, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Danielle Scoliere Rice substituting for Angelyne E. Lisinski as to Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Rice, Danielle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP re #108 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority (Carwile, Tiffany)
November 2, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE by Defendants CME Federal Credit Union, Celtic Bank, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., TD Bank, N.A., Telhio Credit Union of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Pitcher, Kelly)
October 30, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP re #106 Notice (Other), (Carwile, Tiffany)
October 23, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE by Defendant Celtic Bank NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS CELTIC BANK CORPORATION, TD BANK, N.A., TELHIO CREDIT UNION, CME FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., AND BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Liu, Henry)
October 23, 2020 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 MOTION to Strike #91 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #92 Affidavit in Support of Motion, filed by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Carwile, Tiffany)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #32 ). Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendant Bluevine Capital Inc. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/16/2020. (cmw)
October 11, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP re #95 Notice (Other), Regarding Supplemental Authority (Carwile, Tiffany)
October 9, 2020 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION to Strike #91 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #92 Affidavit in Support of Motion, filed by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Liu, Henry)
October 9, 2020 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Liu, Henry)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leonid Traps and Matthew Porpora are GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/30/2020. (daf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7679797) of Matthew Porpora by Defendant TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Harrison, Gregory)
September 29, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7679784) of Leonid Traps by Defendant TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Harrison, Gregory)
September 25, 2020 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Carwile, Tiffany)
September 25, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION to Strike #91 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #92 Affidavit in Support of Motion, by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Carwile, Tiffany)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #74 Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendant Radius Bank without prejudice. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/24/2020. (cmw)
September 23, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Fifth Third Bank N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank N.A., TD Bank, N.A., The Huntington National Bank, N.A. re #31 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Schisler, Harold)
September 9, 2020 Filing 94 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to TD Bank, N.A. on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Arnold, James)
September 9, 2020 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 MOTION for Joinder to Dkt. 33 PNC Bank Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. 56 Reply and Dkt. 73 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Arnold, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DECLARATION OF JAKE BARNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CELTIC BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Liu, Henry)
September 4, 2020 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DECLARATION OF ASHLEY M. SIMONSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CELTIC BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Liu, Henry)
September 4, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 9/25/2020) by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Liu, Henry)
September 4, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE by Defendant TD Bank, N.A. re #56 Reply to Response to Motion, (Harrison, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants TD Bank, N.A., TD Bank US Holding Company, TD Group US Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent TD Bank US Holding Company, Corporate Parent TD Group US Holdings LLC for TD Bank, N.A... (Harrison, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Pitcher for Defendant TD Bank, N.A. (Pitcher, Kelly)
September 4, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Harrison for Defendant TD Bank, N.A. (Harrison, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Radius Bank answer due 9/25/2020. (daf)
September 3, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION for Joinder to Dkt. 33 PNC Bank Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. 56 Reply and Dkt. 73 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Fleming, Daniel)
September 3, 2020 Filing 84 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Radius Bank. (Burke, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., BAC North America Holding Company, NB Holdings Corporation, Bank of America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Fleming, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. of Joinder (Ferak, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Ferak, Paul)
August 27, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP re #73 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Authority (Arnold, James)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brett J. Natarelli ; terminating #59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard Gottlieb. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/25/2020. (daf)
August 25, 2020 Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants PNC Bank N.A., The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank N.A... (Lisinski, Angelyne)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Enu Mainigi, Craig Singer, Jesse Smallwood, and Kenneth Smurzynski are GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/25/2020. (daf)
August 24, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7621401) of KENNETH SMURZYNSKI by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificates of Good Standing) (Fleming, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7621399) of JESSE SMALLWOOD by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificates of Good Standing) (Fleming, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7621387) of CRAIG SINGER by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificates of Good Standing) (Fleming, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7621363) of ENU MAINIGI by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificates of Good Standing) (Fleming, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Radius Bank by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Carwile, Tiffany)
August 19, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re docs. #31 & #42 by Defendants CME Federal Credit Union, Fifth Third Bank N.A., PNC Bank N.A., Telhio Credit Union, The Huntington National Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Schisler, Harold) Modified to create links to motion on 8/19/2020 (eh).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ashley M. Simonsen is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2020. (daf)
August 17, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7608743) of Ashley M. Simonsen by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Liu, Henry)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTATION ORDER - For good cause shown, Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s and Defendant Celtic Bank's Joint Motions for Extension of Time (Doc. #66 , #69 ) are GRANTED. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. and Defendant Celtic Bank shall move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before September 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/17/20. (jr)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Soukup is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/17/2020. (daf)
August 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deficiency Deadline. (daf)
August 17, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY as to Ashley M. Simonsen. (daf)
August 14, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint New date requested 9/4/2020. by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Liu, Henry)
August 14, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7608748) of Andrew J. Soukup by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Liu, Henry)
August 14, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7608743) of Ashley M. Simonsen by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Liu, Henry)
August 14, 2020 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/4/2020. by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fleming, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Reply Brief in Further Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss by Defendants CME Federal Credit Union and Telhio Credit Union [Dkt. 42]] filed by Defendants CME Federal Credit Union, Telhio Credit Union. (Forry, Steven)
August 6, 2020 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Strike and/or Exclude Declaration filed by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Arnold, James)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Kabbage, Inc., pursuant to Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Kabbage, Inc. is removed from action. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/3/2020. (cmw)
July 31, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Strike and/or Exclude Declaration and Request that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Congressional Testimony filed by Defendants Fifth Third Bank N.A., PNC Bank N.A., The Huntington National Bank, N.A.. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Arnold, James)
July 27, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss Kabbage, Inc. by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Carwile, Tiffany)
July 27, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7574196) of Richard Gottlieb by Defendant Kabbage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kostura, Bryan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7574125) of Brett J. Natarelli by Defendant Kabbage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kostura, Bryan)
July 24, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Strike and/or Exclude Declaration by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Arnold, James)
July 21, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Fifth Third Bank N.A., PNC Bank N.A., The Huntington National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison M. Funk is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/21/2020. (daf)
July 20, 2020 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Radius Bank. (Burke, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Liu, Henry)
July 17, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry B Liu for Defendant Celtic Bank (Liu, Henry)
July 17, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7561280) of Allison M. Funk by Defendant Radius Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Burke, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eugene Burke for Defendant Radius Bank (Burke, James)
July 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Celtic Bank answer due 8/25/2020. (er)
July 15, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response to the First Amended Complaint by Defendant Celtic Bank. (Liu, Henry)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Ferak and Jonathan H. Claydon are GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/13/2020. (daf)
July 10, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7549737) of Jonathan H. Claydon by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Richards, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7549718) of Paul J. Ferak by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Richards, John)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Paul Heeringa is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/10/2020. (daf)
July 9, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7546927) of A. Paul Heeringa by Defendant Kabbage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kostura, Bryan)
July 9, 2020 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kabbage, Inc. on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Arnold, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Radius Bank on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Arnold, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Arnold, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Comparison between traditional 7(A) and PPP loans) (Arnold, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants CME Federal Credit Union, Telhio Credit Union. (Forry, Steven)
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bank of America, N.A. answer due 8/25/2020. (daf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION for a 21 Day Extension of Time from August 4, 2020 to August 25, 2020 for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to First Amended Complaint by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Fleming, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Bank of America, N.A. on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Fleming, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Chamberlin Fleming for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Fleming, Daniel)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTATION ORDER - For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Continue the July 15, 2020 Pretrial Conference (Doc. #37 ) is GRANTED. The July 15, 2020 pretrial conference is VACATED. Upon appearance of all of the parties, they are ORDERED to contact the Court and provide it with agreed proposed dates and times for a rescheduled pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/1/20. (jr)
June 30, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Continue July 15, 2020 Pretrial Conference by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/18/2020. The Court will replace the Motion to Dismiss with the one submitted with the Motion to Amend/Correct. (plb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kabbage, Inc.. (Kostura, Bryan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan T Kostura for Defendant Kabbage, Inc. (Kostura, Bryan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct #31 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Fifth Third Bank N.A., PNC Bank N.A., The Huntington National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
June 17, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Bluevine Capital, LLC by Plaintiffs William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Carwile, Tiffany)
June 16, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Fifth Third Bank N.A., PNC Bank N.A., The Huntington National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lisinski, Angelyne) (Main Document 31 and Attachment 1 replaced on 6/18/2020 pursuant to 36.) (ew).
June 16, 2020 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Telhio Credit Union. (Stein, David)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Moses, Jeohn Salone Favors, and Brittany A. Fish is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/15/2020. (daf)
June 15, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to CME Federal Credit Union on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Arnold, James)
June 15, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CME Federal Credit Union. (Forry, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Forry, Kristina Dahmann, and Kishala Srivastava for Defendant CME Federal Credit Union (Forry, Steven) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (ew).
June 12, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Celtic Bank on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Arnold, James)
June 12, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-7508826) of Jon Moses; Jeohn Favors; Brittany Fish by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lisinski, Angelyne)
June 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelyne E. Lisinski for Defendant PNC Bank N.A. (Lisinski, Angelyne)
June 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph O'Malley for Defendant PNC Bank N.A. (O'Malley, Anthony)
June 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany A. Fish for Defendant PNC Bank N.A. (Fish, Brittany)
June 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeohn Salone Favors for Defendant PNC Bank N.A. (Favors, Jeohn)
June 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Moses for Defendant PNC Bank N.A. (Moses, Jonathan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2020 @ 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
June 10, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Huntington National Bank, N.A., Huntington Bancshares, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Bancshares, Inc. for The Huntington National Bank, N.A... (Schisler, Harold)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Fifth Third Bank N.A., Fifth Third Bancorp identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank N.A... (Lampley, Nathaniel)
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Brunner for Defendant Fifth Third Bank N.A. (Brunner, Joseph)
June 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Miller for Defendant Fifth Third Bank N.A. (Miller, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Lampley, Jr for Defendant Fifth Third Bank N.A. (Lampley, Nathaniel)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Fifth Third Bank N.A. (Abrams, Wesley)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Gibson for Defendant Telhio Credit Union (Gibson, Daniel)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David K Stein for Defendant Telhio Credit Union (Stein, David)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/5/2020. (agm)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin M. Jonke is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/5/2020. (daf)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Bookmyer, Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc., Alex Boytan, Boytan & Associates, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Arnold, James)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7492846) of Kevin M. Jonke by Defendant The Huntington National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing) (Schisler, Harold)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elaine P. Golin is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/3/2020. (daf)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7491067) of Elaine P. Golin by Defendant The Huntington National Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing) (Schisler, Harold)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold T Schisler, II for Defendant The Huntington National Bank, N.A. (Schisler, Harold)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Huntington National Bank, N.A. on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Arnold, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to PNC Bank N.A. on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Arnold, James)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fifth Third Bank N.A. on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Arnold, James)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/6/2020. (sln)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7452920), filed by William Bookmyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CME email, #2 Exhibit B - PPP Lender Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - PPP Deck, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Arnold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bookmyer v. PNC Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CME Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Kishala Srivastava
Represented By: Steven David Forry
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jeohn Salone Favors
Represented By: Anthony Joseph O'Malley
Represented By: Brittany A. Fish
Represented By: Jonathan M. Moses
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Represented By: Danielle Scoliere Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Banks 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Harold T Schisler, II
Represented By: Elaine P. Golin
Represented By: Kevin M. Jonke
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Brunner
Represented By: Nathaniel Lampley, Jr
Represented By: Wesley Abrams
Represented By: Jeffrey A Miller
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank
Represented By: Henry B Liu
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Ashley M. Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telhio Credit Union
Represented By: David K Stein
Represented By: Daniel C Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabbage, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan T Kostura
Represented By: Aaron Paul Heeringa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Bank
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Drew M Hicks
Represented By: Allison M. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluevine Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kelly E. Pitcher
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Leonid Traps
Represented By: Matthew Porpora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John R Richards
Represented By: Paul J Ferak
Represented By: Jonathan H Claydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Chamberlin Fleming
Represented By: Craig D. Singer
Represented By: Kenneth C. Smurzynski
Represented By: Enu A Mainigi
Represented By: Jesse Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bookmyer
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Represented By: Damion M Clifford
Represented By: Gerhardt A Gosnell, II
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bookmyer & Associates CPA, Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Boytan
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boytan & Associates, LLP
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?