United States of America v. Eight Thousand One Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($8,100.00) in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eight Thousand One Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($8,100.00) in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2020cv02294
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Last publication date 06/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Publication) (Grimes, Deborah)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service: J. Barker) (Grimes, Deborah)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE re #3 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Return of Service: Defendant in USMS custody by Plaintiff United States of America(Grimes, Deborah) Modified text on 6/3/2020 (kk2)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Issued. Signed by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio on 5/18/2020. (kk2)
May 15, 2020 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem by Plaintiff United States of AmericaSEE DOCKET #2 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Motion for Issuance of Warrant in Rem," which can be found in the "Motions" section of CM/ECF (kk2)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE: Application to the Clerk of the Court to issue a Warrant of Arrest In Rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Warrant of Arrest In Rem) (Grimes, Deborah) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (kk2)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against Eight Thousand One Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($8,100.00) in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grimes, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eight Thousand One Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($8,100.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight Thousand One Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($8,100.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?