Jayjohn v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Danny L Jayjohn, II
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2020cv02977
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/21/2020. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This action is DISMISSED. DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/21/2020. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Danny L Jayjohn, II. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/23/2020. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 18, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $5. Receipt Number: 200COL062075. (ew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re Filing Fee/In Forma Pauperis. Deadline to correct is 7/12/2020. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Danny L Jayjohn, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Env.) (jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jayjohn v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny L Jayjohn, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?