Sanchez v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv03169
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers added. (pb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00038. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/23/2020 GRANTING #5 Motion to Change Venue. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Ohio.(Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Stevens, Cheryl) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 21, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE200106521 $300.00 fbo Bricker and Eckler by Bricker and Eckler on 5/21/2020. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Allen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff requests leave to respond to Defendants Reply. ECF No. 20. The Court DENIES this request and STRIKES Plaintiffs Sur-Reply at ECF No. 20. Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Sur-Reply at ECF No. 22 is rendered moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to STRIKE 20 Plaintiff's Reply by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Stevens, Cheryl) Modified on 5/19/2020 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 21 [DISREGARD - WRONG IMAGE ATTACHED - SEE #22 ] MOTION to STRIKE by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Stevens, Cheryl) Modified on 5/19/2020 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 DOCUMENT STRICKENED and REMOVED Pursuant to 23 Minute Order . Modified on 5/20/2020 (Donati, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: The Court DENIES Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations at ECF No. 17 and declines to consider an amended reply brief. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES Defendants Amended Reply at ECF No. 18. IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 18 DOCUMENT STRICKENED and REMOVED Pursuant to 19 Minute Order. Modified on 5/20/2020 (Donati, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION, or, in the Alternative, for the Court's Consideration of Defendants' Amended Reply Brief by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Stevens, Cheryl) Modified on 5/19/2020 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants exceeded the Courts 5-page limit on reply memoranda. See Reply, ECF No. 13; see also Order re Filing Requirements (Order), ECF No. 3-2. Violations of the Courts standing order require the offending counsel (not the client) to pay $50.00 per page over the page limit to the Clerk of the Court. Order at 1. Moreover, the Court will not consider arguments made past the page limit. Id. In total, Defendants reply memorandum exceeded the Courts page limit by 6 pages. Defendants counsel must therefore send a check payable to the Clerk for the Eastern District of California for $300.00 no later than seven days from the date of this order. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST for CLARIFICATION re #13 Motion to Change Venue by Porfirio Sanchez. (Allen, David) Modified on 5/14/2020 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for May 19, 2020 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re #5 Motion to Change Venue,. (Stevens, Cheryl) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of David Allen in support of #5 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Porfirio Sanchez to #5 Motion to Change Venue,. (Allen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/9/2020 GRANTING #8 Application as to Lisa M. Kathumbi, PHV, to represent Aetna Life Insurance Company and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/9/2020 GRANTING #7 Application as to Attorney Kofi A. Semenya, PHV, to represent Aetna Life Insurance Company and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Lisa M. Kathumbi to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8835806) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stevens, Cheryl) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Kofi A. Semenya to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stevens, Cheryl Alesia added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8835742) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stevens, Cheryl) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Lafayette, Gary) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Lafayette, Gary T. added. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Lafayette, Gary) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Waiver by Nationwide)(Allen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aetna Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Allen* *David Allen & Associates* *5230 Folsom Blvd.* *Sacramento, CA 95819*. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Porfirio Sanchez. Attorney Allen, David added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8651858) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Allen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?