Jude v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Randall Jude
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv03579
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/16/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Julis, Rachel)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, filed by Randall Jude. (daf)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent Form) (daf)
July 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration answer date. (daf)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Randall Jude. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 SS ID Form) (Dixon, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jude v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Jude
Represented By: Jay W Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?