Nelson v. Cook Medical Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ernest Nelson, II
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv03634
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:20-cv-06197, filed 08/20/2020. (er)
August 12, 2020 Case transferred to District of Indiana Southern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-96): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL this case is transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 8/10/2020; certified by the ISD on 8/10/2020. (er)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-96): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the USDC for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 8/10/2020. (er)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC. (daf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7560954), filed by Michael Ernest Nelson, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Cook Group Incorporated Summons Form, #3 Summons Form Cook Incorporated Summons Form, #4 Summons Form Cook Medical Incorporated Summons Form, #5 Summons Form Cook Medical, LLC Summons Form) (Schneider, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Cook Medical Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ernest Nelson, II
Represented By: Louis Carl Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?