Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: MJC America, LTD., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD., GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., MJC America Ltd and Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales Ltd
Case Number: 2:2020cv03935
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The parties submitted their Rule 26(f) Report on September 28, 2020, and indicated their preference that the Court issue a Preliminary Pretrial Order without a conference. Accordingly, the October 2, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2020. Motions to Amend due by 12/1/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive motions due by 5/20/2021. Primary Expert due by 2/1/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 3/15/2021. Settlement Demand due by 10/15/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 12/15/2020. Mediation Deadline: 3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 09/29/2020. (mdr)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales Ltd, MJC America Ltd. & All Plaintiffs (Kita, Kevin) Modified parties on 9/29/2020 (kk2)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William N Clark Jr by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/24/2020 (kk2)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7670156) of William N. Clark, Jr. by Plaintiffs Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Avellano, Andrew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2020 01:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #1 Complaint filed by Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales Ltd, MJC America Ltd. (Kita, Kevin) Modified text on 9/15/2020 (kk2)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Mr. Clark is DIRECTED to cease filing documents in this case unless and until he has moved for and been granted pro hac vice status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/27/2020. (daf)
August 26, 2020 Notice of Correction re #13 Summons Returned Executed: The incorrect service and answer dates were entered in to CM/ECF by counsel when this document was filed. The corrected document with the proper dates has been re-filed as ECF #14 Summons Returned Executed (kk2)
August 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gree USA, Inc. answer due 9/2/2020 per #14 (kk2)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Gree USA, Inc. Gree USA, Inc. served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Clark, William) Modified on 8/26/2020 to correct answer due date (kk2)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 **SEE ECF #14 FOR CORRECTED FILING** - SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Gree USA, Inc. Gree USA, Inc. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Clark, William) Modified on 8/26/2020 (kk2)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales Ltd. Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales Ltd served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Clark, William)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai. Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Clark, William)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant MJC America Ltd. MJC America Ltd served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Clark, William)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney William N Clark Jr. (kk2)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales Ltd. (kk2)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai (kk2)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MJC America Ltd. (kk2)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gree USA, Inc. (kk2)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Corrected Summons Forms (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Corrected MJC Summons, #2 Summons Form Corrected Gree Electric Appliances Summons, #3 Summons Form Corrected Hong Kong Gree Summons) (Avellano, Andrew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Plaintiff Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Avellano, Andrew) Modified text on 8/5/2020 (kk2)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Plaintiff Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Avellano, Andrew) Modified text on 8/5/2020 (kk2)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7590959), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Gree USA Summons, #3 Summons Form MJC Summons, #4 Summons Form Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. Summons, #5 Summons Form Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD.) (Avellano, Andrew) Modified parties on 8/5/2020 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Represented By: Kevin W Kita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin W Kita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd
Represented By: Kevin W Kita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales Ltd
Represented By: Kevin W Kita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew P. Avellano
Represented By: William N Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew P. Avellano
Represented By: William N Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?