Wilson et al v. RC Griffith Construction LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan and Administrator Carol A Wilson
Defendant: RC GRIFFITH CONSTRUCTION LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04172
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT against RC Griffith Construction LLC and in favor of Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan & Carol A Wilson (kk2)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment against R.C. Griffith Construction, LLC by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan, Carol A Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Clark, Daniel)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant RC Griffith Construction LLC (kk2)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 Application to Clerk for entry of default against RC Griffith Construction LLC . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Clark, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant RC Griffith Construction LLC. RC Griffith Construction LLC served on 9/12/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Clark, Daniel) Modified on 10/7/2020 to correct service date (kk2)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Alias Summons Issued as to RC Griffith Construction LLC (kk2)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Clark, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RC Griffith Construction LLC (kk2)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan, Carol A Wilson. (Clark, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RC Griffith Construction LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7610543), filed by Carol A Wilson, Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Clark, Daniel) Modified party name on 8/18/2020 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. RC Griffith Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Daniel J Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrator Carol A Wilson
Represented By: Daniel J Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RC GRIFFITH CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?