Tanner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Emily Tanner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv04306
Filed: August 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 For good cause shown, Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/16/2020. (KAJ)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/21/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Ochoa, Susana)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana)
August 24, 2020 Set Deadlines: Answer due 10/23/2020. (ew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Emily Tanner. (ew)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Administrative Record, which shall serve as the answer, due within sixty (60) days after service. Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Reply due fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, they should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge) (ew)
August 23, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Emily Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Yocum, Mindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Tanner
Represented By: Mindy Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?