NetJets Aviation, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U,S. Department of Agriculture and U.S. Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 2:2020cv04464
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement c/o Office of the Principal Legal Advisor (kk2)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF re #13 Order by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Shumate, Keith)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE re #10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA: CORRECTED Affidavit of Service (U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement) by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Shumate, Keith)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re #12 Summons Returned Executed as to USA: CORRECTED Affidavit of Service (U.S. Department of Homeland Securitye) by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Shumate, Keith)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE re #11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA: CORRECTED Affidavit of Service (U.S. Customs and Border Protection) by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Shumate, Keith)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE re #9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA: CORRECTED Affidavit of Service (U.S. Department of Agriculture) by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Shumate, Keith)
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Shumate, Keith)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On or before September 28, 2020, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a supplemental brief demonstrating that they have effected service of process consistent with the Federal Rules and, in particular, Rule 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/18/2020. (ew)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Department of Homeland Security. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Bradley, Keith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Customs and Border Protection. U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Bradley, Keith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Bradley, Keith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Department of Agriculture. U.S. Department of Agriculture served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Bradley, Keith)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Corey McGehee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/15/2020. (er)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7651798) of Corey D. McGehee by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc.. (Shumate, Keith)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Keith Bradley by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/31/2020 (kk2)
August 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines re #4 : Deficiency Deadline due by 9/14/2020 (kk2)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Corey McGehee: The required certificate of good standing is not from the highest court of the State (kk2)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Agriculture, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Immigration and Customs Enforcement, #2 Summons Form Customs and Border Protection, #3 Summons Form Homeland Security) (kk2)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7631667) of Corey McGehee by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Shumate, Keith)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7631660) of Keith Bradley by Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Shumate, Keith)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate NetJets, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Plaintiff NetJets Aviation, Inc. (Shumate, Keith) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (kk2)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Agriculture, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7631645), filed by NetJets Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form (U.S. Department of Agriculture), #3 Summons Form (U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement), #4 Summons Form (U.S. Customs and Border Protection), #5 Summons Form (U.S. Department of Homeland Security)) (Shumate, Keith) Modified party name on 8/31/2020 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NetJets Aviation, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U,S. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Shumate
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Represented By: Corey McGehee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?