Jetty v. Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Linda Jetty
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv05572
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 1/25/2021. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/23/2020. (agm)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/11/2021. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Julis, Rachel)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Linda Jetty. (daf)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent Form) (daf)
October 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 12/26/2020. (daf)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Linda Jetty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Soc Sec Identification Form) (Hall, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jetty v. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jetty
Represented By: Julie A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?