Stormborn Technologies LLC v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv05613
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for The Boeing Company to answer to complaint by 1/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/11/2020. (er)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 1/8/2021. by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wernow, Howard)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: The Boeing Company served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (er)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (daf)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Boeing Company. (daf)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Boeing Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7728206), filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE44199E, #2 Exhibit B-Schilling Declaration w Exhibits, #3 Exhibit C-Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard) (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/30/2020) (daf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?