Romanowicz v. Buckeye Sound, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Adam Romanowicz
Defendant: Buckeye Sounds LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05745
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER - For good cause shown, Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension (Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant may have until January 4, 2021 to obtain counsel and respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/22/20. (jr)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint New date requested 1/4/2021. by Defendant Buckeye Sounds LLC. (mdr)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The judges agree that cases 2:20-cv-5745, 2:20-cv-5746, 2:20-cv-5747, 2:20-cv-5748, 2:20-cv-5749, and 2:20-cv-5771 ARE related. Cases reassigned to Judge James L. Graham and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham, Judge Sarah D. Morrison, Judge Michael H. Watson, and Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/18/2020. (ew)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Buckeye Sounds LLC. (mdr)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Buckeye Sounds LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7741244), filed by Adam Romanowicz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Gugliotta, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romanowicz v. Buckeye Sound, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Sounds LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Romanowicz
Represented By: John Gugliotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?