Ollison v. Artech, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Rapheal Ollison
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase & Co and Artech, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05864
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, and JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC must move or plead in response to the complaint by 2/16/2021. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/5/2021. (agm)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/16/2021. by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time) (Strauss, Catherine)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Artech, L.L.C. on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Hurm, Matthew)
December 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: JPMorgan Chase & Co answer due 1/5/2021; JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association answer due 1/5/2021; JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC answer due 1/5/2021. (daf)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/5/2021. to Move or Plead by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC. (Strauss, Catherine) Modified text on 12/16/2020 (daf).
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Service - as to Defendants Artech, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC. Artech, L.L.C.; JPMorgan Chase & Co; JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association; JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form JPMC Executed, #2 Summons Form JPMC Bank National Association Executed, #3 Summons Form JPMC Holdings Executed) (Hurm, Matthew) Modified event and terminated answer due date on 12/8/2020 (jlk).
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Artech, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC. (jlk)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Artech, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7751002), filed by Rapheal Ollison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Artech, #3 Summons Form JPMorgan Chase & Co., #4 Summons Form JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, #5 Summons Form JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC) (Hurm, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ollison v. Artech, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artech, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rapheal Ollison
Represented By: Matthew T. Hurm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?