Sage v. The Estate of Nigel Kelsall, Yvonne Kelsall, Executor et al
Plaintiff: Heather A Sage
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance, Ultraseal America, Inc., The Estate of Nigel Kelsall, Yvonne Kelsall, Executor, SIFO Applied Surface Concepts, LLC, Norman Hay, PLC, John Doe Corporations #1-10, International Metall IMPragnier GmbH and Frankenmuth Insurance
Case Number: 2:2020cv06015
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R. Bush, John G. Farnan, Steven G. Carlino, and Joshua C. Berns for Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance (Bush, Kevin) Modified text on 12/30/2020 (ew).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. Eric Smearman as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/8/2020. (ew)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henry Stoffers for Defendant Frankenmuth Insurance (Stoffers, Robert)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 1) of R. Eric Smearman by Plaintiff Heather A Sage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of R. Eric Smearman, #2 Exhibit A-1-Certificate of Good Standing) (Boyer, Kallen)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney R. Eric Smearman. (daf)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7766122), filed by Heather A Sage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Civil Cover Sheet) (Boyer, Kallen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sage v. The Estate of Nigel Kelsall, Yvonne Kelsall, Executor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance
Represented By: Kevin Roy Bush
Represented By: Joshua C. Berns
Represented By: John G Farnan
Represented By: Steven G Carlino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultraseal America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Nigel Kelsall, Yvonne Kelsall, Executor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIFO Applied Surface Concepts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Hay, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Metall IMPragnier GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankenmuth Insurance
Represented By: Robert Henry Stoffers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather A Sage
Represented By: Kallen Lynn Boyer
Represented By: R. Eric Smearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?