Wolf Creek Contracting Company, LLC v. PCM Contracting Services LLC
Plaintiff: Wolf Creek Contracting Company, LLC
Defendant: PCM Contracting Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06331
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment against PCM Contracting Services LLC by Plaintiff Wolf Creek Contracting Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Corcoran, Daniel)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PCM Contracting Services LLC. (daf)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for entry of default against PCM Contracting Services LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Corcoran, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant PCM Contracting Services LLC. The named Defendant was served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (daf)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Wolf Creek Contracting Company, LLC. (Corcoran, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PCM Contracting Services LLC. (daf)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PCM Contracting Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7854317), filed by Wolf Creek Contracting Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Form) (Corcoran, Daniel) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/14/2020) (daf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf Creek Contracting Company, LLC v. PCM Contracting Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCM Contracting Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolf Creek Contracting Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Corcoran
Represented By: Adam James Schwendeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?