Schafer Investments, Ltd. v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Schafer Investments, Ltd.
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00396
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Mediation in July 2021. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 3/25/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 3/11/2021. Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Fact Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2021. Primary Expert due by 10/4/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/25/2021. Settlement Demand due by 6/15/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/25/2021. (ew)
February 24, 2021 NOTICE: The PPTC set for 2/25/2021 is VACATED. (See ECF No. #9 .) (sln)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Schafer Investments, Ltd. & Defendant Speedway LLC. (Downer, Cameron) Modified parties on 2/17/2021 (kk2)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 **SEE 2/12/2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY** - NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Born for Defendant Speedway LLC (Born, Michael) Modified on 2/12/2021 (kk2)
February 12, 2021 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheri Ann Budzynski for Defendant Speedway LLCSEE DOCKET #8 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to indicate, and add, the correct attorney entering the appearance to the docket (kk2)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Complaint filed by Speedway LLC. (Born, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Speedway LLC, filed by Schafer Investments, Ltd. in the Union County Court of Common Pleas as Case No. 20CV0177 on December 24, 2020. (mdr)
February 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Speedway LLC answer due 2/8/2021. (mdr)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Speedway LLC Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Born, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Born, Michael J. O'Callaghan and Ali W. Latif for Defendant Speedway LLC (Born, Michael) Modified text on 2/1/2021 (mdr).
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Speedway LLC. (Born, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Common Pleas, case number 20CV0177 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8059955), filed by Speedway LLC. (Born, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schafer Investments, Ltd. v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schafer Investments, Ltd.
Represented By: Cameron C Downer
Represented By: Joshua A Koltak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Michael E Born
Represented By: Cheri Ann Budzynski
Represented By: Ali Walid Latif
Represented By: Michael J O'Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?