Jackson v. Richard et al
Plaintiff: Serrina Jackson
Defendant: City of Columbus, Ohio, Joe Richard and Columbus Division of Fire
Case Number: 2:2021cv00574
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Serrina Jackson. (Peterson, Kirstin)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2021 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Serrina Jackson. (Peterson, Kirstin)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint filed by Joe Richard. (James, Larry)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint filed by City of Columbus, Ohio, Columbus Division of Fire. (Tanoury, Alana)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Bernhart for Defendants City of Columbus, Ohio, Columbus Division of Fire (Bernhart, Paul)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zachary Bridges by Plaintiff Serrina Jackson. (Peterson, Kirstin)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Holliday James for Defendant Joe Richard (James, Larry)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Columbus, Ohio, Columbus Division of Fire, Joe Richard, filed by Serrina Jackson. (daf)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 20CV003067 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8097335), filed by City of Columbus, Ohio, Columbus Division of Fire, Joe Richard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Compliance) (Tanoury, Alana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus, Ohio
Represented By: Alana Valle Tanoury
Represented By: Paul Bernhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Richard
Represented By: Alana Valle Tanoury
Represented By: Natalie P. Bryans
Represented By: Larry Holliday James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Division of Fire
Represented By: Alana Valle Tanoury
Represented By: Paul Bernhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serrina Jackson
Represented By: John Keith Fitch
Represented By: Kirstin A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?