MCP IP, LLC v. .30-06 Outdoors et al
Plaintiff: MCP IP, LLC
Defendant: Daibow Inc.. and .30-06 Outdoors
Case Number: 2:2021cv00581
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant.30-06 Outdoors answer due 4/15/2021. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/1/2021. (agm)
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, New date requested 4/15/2021. by Defendant.30-06 Outdoors. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jewell, Gretchen)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Lee Jewell for Defendant.30-06 Outdoors (Jewell, Gretchen)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Daibow Inc... Daibow Inc.. served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Jelenchick, Kadie)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion for Service by Publication. Plaintiff's request to serve Daibow by publication is DENIED, but Plaintiff's request to serve Daibow via email is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/30/2021. (daf)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Service by Publication and/or E-mail by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michelle A. Moran, #2 Exhibit 1. Colorado Secretary of State - Summary - Daibow Inc., #3 Exhibit 2. Affidavit of Non-Service, #4 Exhibit 3. Email, #5 Exhibit 4. Email Delivery Receipt) (Jelenchick, Kadie)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTATION ORDER - Construing the parties' stipulation (ECF No. #14 ) as a motion for extension of time, the parties' motion is GRANTED. Defendant.30-06 Outdoors shall have until 4/1/2021 to move or plead in response to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/18/2021. (agm)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION (Second Joint) to Extend Pleading Deadline by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC. (Tackett, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines:.30-06 Outdoors answer due 3/18/2021. (jlk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Pleading Deadline by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC. (Tackett, Christopher)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Daibow Inc. (jlk)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kadie M. Jelenchick; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michelle Moran as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on February 17, 2021. (jlk)
February 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8118641) of Michelle A. Moran by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Tackett, Christopher)
February 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8118581) of Kadie M. Jelenchick by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Tackett, Christopher)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant.30-06 Outdoors..30-06 Outdoors served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Tackett, Christopher)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Tackett, Christopher)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to.30-06 Outdoors. (jlk)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Tackett, Christopher)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Tackett, Christopher)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Tackett, Christopher) Modified text on 2/10/2021 (jlk).
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff MCP IP, LLC. (Tackett, Christopher)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8098546), filed by MCP IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - About Daibow, Archery, Sporting Goods Store, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2020-01-09 Letter to.30-06 Outdoors, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2020-01-27 Letter to.30-06 Outdoors, #4 Exhibit 4 - Daibow Manual Annotated, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2011-2012-Mathews-Owners-Manual, #6 Exhibit 6- Daibow Acuity-Vigor-Tachyon Manual, #7 Exhibit A - US8950388B2, #8 Exhibit AA - U.S. Patent 8,950,388 Claim Chart - Daibow Acuity, #9 Exhibit B - US9303946B2, #10 Exhibit BB - US9303946B2, #11 Exhibit C - USD884818S1, #12 Exhibit CC - U.S. Patent D884,818 Claim Chart - Topoint TP640 Stabilizer, #13 Exhibit D - US8683989B1, #14 Exhibit DD - U.S. Patent 8,683,989 Claim Chart -Topoint (Daibow) M1, #15 Exhibit E - US9354017B2, #16 Exhibit EE - U.S. Patent 9,354,017 Claim Chart -Topoint (Daibow) M1, #17 Exhibit F - US9909831B2, #18 Exhibit FF - U.S. Patent 9,909,831 Claim Chart -Topoint (Daibow) M1, #19 Exhibit G - US8505526B1, #20 Exhibit GG - U.S. Patent 8,505,526 Claim Chart - Daibow Trigon, #21 Exhibit H - US9389040B2, #22 Exhibit HH - U.S. Patent 9,389,040 Claim Chart - Daibow Trigon, #23 Exhibit I - US9851169B2, #24 Exhibit II - U.S. Patent 9,851,169 Claim Chart - Daibow Trigon, #25 Exhibit J - US8622052B1, #26 Exhibit JJ - U.S. Patent 8,622,052 Claim Chart - Topoint M1, #27 Exhibit K - USD639888S1, #28 Exhibit KK - U.S. Patent D639,888 Claim Chart - Topoint M1 Grip, #29 Exhibit L - US8402960B2, #30 Exhibit LL - U.S. Patent 8,402,960 Claim Chart - Daibow Acuity, #31 Exhibit M - US8671929B2, #32 Exhibit MM - U.S. Patent 8,671,929 Claim Chart - Daibow Acuity, #33 Exhibit N - US 10,175,021, #34 Exhibit NN - U.S. Patent 10,175,021 Claim Chart - Daibow Acuity, #35 Exhibit O - TM App No 90394448, #36 Exhibit P - TM App No 90394461, #37 Exhibit Q - Navi Carbon Stabilizer) (Tackett, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCP IP, LLC v. .30-06 Outdoors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCP IP, LLC
Represented By: Christopher W. Tackett
Represented By: Kadie M. Jelenchick
Represented By: Michelle A. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daibow Inc..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .30-06 Outdoors
Represented By: Gretchen Lee Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?