Monteiro v. Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Monteiro
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A., Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assocation, AmeriCredit Financial Services, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Ally Bank, Global Lending Services LLC, Capital One Auto Finance Inc, Park National Corporation, Fifth Third Bancorp, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Citizens Financial Group, Inc. doing business as Citizens Bank, Santander Consumer USA, Inc. doing business as Chrysler Corporation, Park National Corporation Southwest Ohio and Northern Kentucky doing business as Park National Bank, AmeriCredit Financial Services doing business as GM Financial, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company doing business as M&T Bank, Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. doing business as Jeff Wyler Chevrolet, Inc. and Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00625
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTATION ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. shall move or plead in response to the complaint by 4/23/21. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/9/2021. (agm)
April 8, 2021 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation pending arbitration by Defendant Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Chapman, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTATION ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Global Lending Services LLC answer due 4/23/2021. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/5/2021. (agm)
April 5, 2021 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, New date requested 4/23/2021. by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A.. (Dirisamer, David)
April 2, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/23/2021. Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Global Lending Services LLC. (Abrams, Wesley)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTATION ORDER granting #47 , #48 , #49 , and #51 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. AmeriCredit Financial Services and Ally Bank shall move or plead in response to the Complaint by 4/16/21; Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Park National Corporation, and U.S. Bank National Association shall move or plead in response to the Complaint by 4/21/21; and Capital One Auto Finance shall move or plead in response to the Complaint by 4/23/21. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/2/2021. (agm)
April 1, 2021 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 4/21/2021. by Defendants Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Park National Corporation, U.S. Bank National Assocation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Chapman, Michael)
April 1, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chapman for Defendants Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Park National Corporation, U.S. Bank National Assocation (Chapman, Michael)
April 1, 2021 Filing 49 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, New date requested 4/23/2021. Second Motion For Extension by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hauser, Laura)
April 1, 2021 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, New date requested 4/16/2021. by Defendant Ally Bank. (Padgett, Austin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, New date requested 4/16/2021. by Defendant AmeriCredit Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sandy, James)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTATION ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Fifth Third Bank, N.A. answer due 4/13/2021. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/1/2021. (agm)
April 1, 2021 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Santander Consumer USA, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc. dba Chrysler Capital, Santander Consumer USA Holdings, Inc., Banco Santander, SA identifying Corporate Parent Santander Consumer USA, Inc. dba Chrysler Capital, Corporate Parent Santander Consumer USA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Banco Santander, SA for Santander Consumer USA, Inc... (Deka, Stefanie)
April 1, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Deka, Stefanie)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTATION ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ethan Ostroff as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on March 31, 2021. (jlk)
March 31, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, New date requested 4/13/2021. by Defendant Fifth Third Bancorp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Czanik, Kara)
March 30, 2021 Filing 41 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A.. Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Dirisamer, David)
March 29, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATION AGREED STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION OF DEFENDANT FIFTH THIRD BANK, N.A. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 25(c) by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian)
March 25, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8234968) of Ethan G. Ostroff by Defendant Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Padgett, Austin)
March 19, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Saxton for Defendant Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. (Saxton, Jonathan)
March 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Global Lending Services LLC answer due 4/2/2021. (jlk)
March 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Capital One Auto Finance Inc answer due 4/2/2021. (jlk)
March 12, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc.. (Chapman, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Chapman for Defendant Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. (Chapman, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss and compel arbitration by Defendant Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit credit application, #2 Exhibit buyers order, #3 Exhibit retail installment sale contract, #4 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Chapman, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A., JPMorgan Chase & Co identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A... (Dirisamer, David)
March 12, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Global Lending Services LLC. (Abrams, Wesley)
March 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ally Bank answer due 4/2/2021. (jlk)
March 11, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A.. (Dirisamer, David)
March 10, 2021 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance Inc. (Hauser, Laura)
March 10, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO PLEAD by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance Inc. (Hauser, Laura)
March 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: AmeriCredit Financial Services answer due 4/2/2021; Park National Corporation answer due 4/2/2021; Santander Consumer USA, Inc. answer due 4/2/2021; U.S. Bank National Assocation answer due 4/2/2021. (jlk)
March 9, 2021 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ally Bank. (Padgett, Austin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension by Defendant Ally Bank. (Padgett, Austin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin D Padgett for Defendant Ally Bank (Padgett, Austin)
March 8, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Leave to Plead by Defendant AmeriCredit Financial Services. (Sandy, James)
March 5, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant U.S. Bank National Assocation. (Guc, Mitchell)
March 5, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Lawrence Guc for Defendant U.S. Bank National Assocation (Guc, Mitchell)
March 5, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION TO MOVE OR PLEAD Filed by Defendant Park National Corporation. (LaRocco, Christopher)
March 4, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Leave to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Deka, Stefanie)
March 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fifth Third Bancorp answer due 4/2/2021. (er)
March 3, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AmeriCredit Financial Services, General Motors Company identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company for AmeriCredit Financial Services.. (Sandy, James)
March 3, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT FIFTH THIRD BAN, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, IMPROPERLY NAMED FIFTH THIRD BANCORP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Fifth Third Bancorp. (Czanik, Kara)
March 3, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bancorp identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bancorp.. (Czanik, Kara)
March 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Ann Czanik for Defendant Fifth Third Bancorp (Czanik, Kara)
March 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Sandy for Defendant AmeriCredit Financial Services (Sandy, James)
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Global Lending Services LLC (Abrams, Wesley)
February 25, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A.. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc.. Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefanie L Deka for Defendant Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Deka, Stefanie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ally Bank. Ally Bank served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant AmeriCredit Financial Services. AmeriCredit Financial Services served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Capital One Auto Finance Inc. Capital One Auto Finance Inc served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Citizens Financial Group, Inc.. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Fifth Third Bancorp. Fifth Third Bancorp served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Global Lending Services LLC. Global Lending Services LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Assocation. U.S. Bank National Assocation served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Park National Corporation. Park National Corporation served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Santander Consumer USA, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ally Bank, AmeriCredit Financial Services, Capital One Auto Finance Inc, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Fifth Third Bancorp, Global Lending Services LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A., Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc., Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Park National Corporation, Santander Consumer USA, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assocation. (jlk)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8113126), filed by Jose Monteiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - RISC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Suburban Title, #3 Exhibit 3 - Credit Pulls, #4 Exhibit 4 - GM Financial, #5 Exhibit 5 - Other Credit Denials, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Form Summons - Wyler, #8 Summons Form Summons - Ally, #9 Summons Form Summons - Americredit, #10 Summons Form Summons - Cap One, #11 Summons Form Summons - Citizens, #12 Summons Form Summons - Fifth Third, #13 Summons Form Summons - Global, #14 Summons Form Summons - Chase, #15 Summons Form Summons - M&T, #16 Summons Form Summons - Park Natl, #17 Summons Form Summons - Santander, #18 Summons Form Summons - US Bank) (Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monteiro v. Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A.
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Assocation
Represented By: Mitchell Lawrence Guc
Represented By: Michael J Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriCredit Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Austin D Padgett
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Lending Services LLC
Represented By: Wesley Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance Inc
Represented By: Laura A Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bancorp
Represented By: Kara Ann Czanik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc. doing business as Citizens Bank
Represented By: Michael J Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc. doing business as Chrysler Corporation
Represented By: Stefanie L Deka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park National Corporation Southwest Ohio and Northern Kentucky doing business as Park National Bank
Represented By: Christopher A. LaRocco
Represented By: Michael J Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriCredit Financial Services doing business as GM Financial
Represented By: James W Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company doing business as M&T Bank
Represented By: Michael J Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. doing business as Jeff Wyler Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Chapman
Represented By: Jonathan P Saxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kara Ann Czanik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Monteiro
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?