Slipher v. Washington Prime Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Randy Slipher
Defendant: Washington Prime Group, Inc., Mark E. Yale and Louis Conforti
Petitioner: Josef Jonathan
Case Number: 2:2021cv02757
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Movant Josef Jonathan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration - Early Notice, #5 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Declaration - PSLRA Certification, #6 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Declaration - Loss Chart, #7 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Declaration - RLF Resume, #8 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Declaration - Karon LLC Resume) (Karon, Daniel)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Randy Slipher. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Declaration of Andrew Kimble, #2 Exhibit Decl. Ex. A - Press Release, #3 Exhibit Decl. Ex. B - Certification of, #4 Exhibit Decl. Ex. C - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit Decl. Ex. D - Proposed Lead Counsel Firm Resume, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Kimble, Andrew)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:21-cv-3431 are related. Signed by Judge James L. Graham and Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 6/17/2021. (kk2)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Randy Slipher (Kimble, Andrew)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Washington Prime Group, Inc.. Washington Prime Group, Inc. served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Kimble, Andrew)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Louis Conforti. (ds)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark E. Yale. (ds)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Washington Prime Group, Inc. (ds)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8328274), filed by Randy Slipher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons to Washington Prime Group, Inc., #3 Summons Form Summons to Mark E. Yale, #4 Summons Form Summons to Louis Conforti, #5 Exhibit 1 - Certification and Sched A) (Kimble, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slipher v. Washington Prime Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Prime Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Yale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Conforti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Slipher
Represented By: Andrew P Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Josef Jonathan
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?