Sinomax USA, Inc. v. American Signature, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sinomax USA, Inc.
Defendant: American Signature Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv03925
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/7/21. (jr)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 8/17/2021; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 12/15/2021; Discovery due by 8/31/2022; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 9/10/2021; Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2022; Primary Expert due by 6/1/2022; Rebuttal Expert due by 8/1/2022; Settlement Demand due by 9/13/2021; Response to Settlement Demand due fifteen (15) days thereafter; Case is referred to Mediation in 3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/12/2021. (kk2)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/12/2021. (jr)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Sinomax USA, Inc.. (Reid, Nelson)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2021 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTATION ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James P. Berg as co-counsel; granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Diane C. Ragosa co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 28, 2021. (jlk)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8415812) of Diane C. Ragosa by Plaintiff Sinomax USA, Inc.. (Reid, Nelson)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8415790) of James P. Berg by Plaintiff Sinomax USA, Inc.. (Reid, Nelson)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson Marlin Reid for Plaintiff Sinomax USA, Inc. (Reid, Nelson)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses filed by American Signature Inc. (Little, Marion)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-11483. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (er)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #10 Consent Order. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER terminating #6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. In light of D.E. 10, D.E. 6 is terminated as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/28/21.(TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, Eastern Division. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/28/2021. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed Order Transferring Case to the USDC, Southern District of Ohio, Eastern Division by AMERICAN SIGNATURE, INC.. (WRIGHT, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT WRIGHT on behalf of AMERICAN SIGNATURE, INC. (WRIGHT, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN SIGNATURE, INC. identifying american signature as Corporate Parent.. (NAZIR, ZAARA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AMERICAN SIGNATURE, INC.. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Statement 7.1 Corporate Disclosure)(NAZIR, ZAARA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SINOMAX USA, INC.. All Plaintiffs. (RAGOSA, DIANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN SIGNATURE, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sinomax USA, Inc.. (RAGOSA, DIANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12476393) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Sinomax USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark)(RAGOSA, DIANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinomax USA, Inc. v. American Signature, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinomax USA, Inc.
Represented By: DIANE C. RAGOSA
Represented By: JAMES PAUL BERG
Represented By: Nelson Marlin Reid
Represented By: Christopher P. Gordon
Represented By: Gregory J Krabacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Signature Inc
Represented By: Robert Wright
Represented By: ZAARA BAJWA NAZIR
Represented By: Marion H Little
Represented By: Brett A Schatz
Represented By: Julie Frances Kappelman
Represented By: Kris Banvard
Represented By: Theodore R Remaklus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?