Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. et al v. Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC
Plaintiff: Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. and Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.
Defendant: Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03949
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTATION ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yafeez S Fatabhoy as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/2/2021. (kk2)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John S Artz as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/2/2021. (kk2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Corrected Certificate of Good Standing re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8478615) of John S. Artz by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (kk2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Corrected Certificate of Good Standing re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8478625) of Yafeez S. Fatabhoy by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan) Created link to motion on 9/1/2021 (er). Modified text on 9/2/2021 (kk2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 **DUPLICATE FILING - SEE DOCKET #14 ** - NOTICE by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8478625) of Yafeez S. Fatabhoy Certificate of Good Standing (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified on 9/2/2021 (kk2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 **DUPLICATE FILING - SEE DOCKET #13 ** - CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8478615) of John S. Artz John Shepherd Artz Certificate of Good Standing by Jonathan Rea Secrest Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified on 9/2/2021 (kk2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 **DUPLICATE FILING - SEE DOCKET #14 ** - CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8478625) of Yafeez S. Fatabhoy Yafeez Sohil Fatabhoy Certificate of Good Standing by Jonathan Rea Secrest Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified on 9/2/2021 (kk2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John S. Artz & #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yafeez S. Fatabhoy: The submitted certificates of good standing are not from the highest court of a State as required. Deficiency Deadline due by 9/15/2021. (kk2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8478625) of Yafeez S. Fatabhoy by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8478615) of John S. Artz by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19): Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return HCOX R091 C19 / M. NEVETT) (kk2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Alias Summons and Complaint sent by certified mail to Capital Pharmaceutical LLC (3238 North Section Line Road) (kk2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC c/o Sean A Crawford Statutory Agent (kk2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC (kk2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons - Statutory Agent (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified on 8/19/2021 (kk2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Alias Summons. (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified on 8/19/2021 (kk2)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Summons and Complaint sent by certified mail to Capital Pharmaceutical LLC (kk2)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of Complaint re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (kk2)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC (kk2)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Secrest, Jonathan)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8403547), filed by Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified on 7/15/2021 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. et al v. Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutramax Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Rea Secrest
Represented By: Yafeez Sohil Fatabhoy
Represented By: John S Artz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Rea Secrest
Represented By: John S Artz
Represented By: Yafeez Sohil Fatabhoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Pharmaceutical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?