Cauthen v. Weil et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Cauthen
Defendant: Luis Weil and Offices at Rickenbacker, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03996
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/7/2021 02:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via certified mail on August 23, 2021 to the following Defendant(s): Luis Weil, 6772 Birchton Point Drive, Dublin, Oh 43017, 7160 3901 9848 9479 5116. (jlk)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 Alias Summons Issued as to Luis Weil. (jlk)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Meluch, Maribeth)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiff Gerald Cauthen Verifying Citizenship of LLC Members (Tackett, Christopher)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/12/2021. (agm)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Gerald Cauthen. (Tackett, Christopher)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer to confirm the citizenship of every member of the above-listed LLCs, and Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice verifying the citizenship of each of those members, all within FOURTEEN DAYS of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/6/2021. (daf)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Gerald Cauthen IDENTIFYING CITIZENSHIP OF MEMBERS OF LLC DEFENDANT (Tackett, Christopher)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Offices at Rickenbacker, LLC. (jlk)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via certified mail to the following Defendant(s): Offices at Rickenbacker, LLC, c/o Statutory Agent A.G.C. Co., 200 Civic Center Drive, Ste 1200, Columbus, Oh 43215, 7160 3901 9848 9479 5123. (jlk)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Luis Weil. (jlk)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Tackett, Christopher)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice within FOURTEEN DAYS identifying the citizenship of the remaining members of the LLC defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/26/2021. (daf)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8417128), filed by Gerald Cauthen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Tackett, Christopher) (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/12/2021) (agm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cauthen v. Weil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Cauthen
Represented By: Christopher W. Tackett
Represented By: Daniel Gerard Rohletter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Weil
Represented By: Maribeth Meluch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offices at Rickenbacker, LLC
Represented By: Maribeth Meluch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?